This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 06:24:57 (UTC).

PETER J. CHANG VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 PETER J CHANG filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1213

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG PETER J.

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AYVAZIAN SALLY A.

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/31/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/31/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/31/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/10/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant); As to: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 06/08/2023; Service Cost: 30.89; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less