This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2023 at 03:12:28 (UTC).

PETER J. CHANG VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 PETER J CHANG filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1213

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG PETER J.

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AYVAZIAN SALLY A.

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/31/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/31/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/31/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/31/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/10/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/19/2023

10/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/19/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

10/19/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Settlement

10/19/2023: Notice of Settlement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/12/2024

Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/19/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/19/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors LLC (Defendant); As to: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 06/08/2023; Service Cost: 30.89; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Peter J. Chang (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less