This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 05:16:38 (UTC).

JEANNETTE SANCHEZ VS LAKEWOOD EYE PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS, INC., A MEDICAL GROUP

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 JEANNETTE SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LAKEWOOD EYE PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS, INC , A MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1175

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ JEANNETTE

Defendant

LAKEWOOD EYE PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS INC. A MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FATTAHI ARRASH T.

MARQUEZ JUSTIN F.

Defendant Attorneys

HEALY AMBER STAR

OBERST HAILEY NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

5/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 05/25/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/25/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 05/25/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

5/25/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/11/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD EYE PHYSICALS AND SURGEONS, INC.

8/9/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD EYE PHYSICALS AND SURGEONS, INC.

Initial Status Conference Report

8/22/2023: Initial Status Conference Report

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

8/24/2023: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF JEANNETTE SANCHEZS POSTING OF JURY FEES

8/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF JEANNETTE SANCHEZS POSTING OF JURY FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/15/2023 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Plaintiff Jeannette Sanchezs Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jeannette Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Initial Status Conference Response Statement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Lakewood Eye Physicians and Surgeons, Inc., A Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Report; Filed by: Jeannette Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Initial Status Conference Response Statement: Exact Name: Joint Initial Status Conference Response Statement ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Judicial Bulletin Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stuart M. Rice in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeannette Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Lakewood Eye Physicians and Surgeons, Inc., A Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeannette Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Lakewood Eye Physicians and Surgeons, Inc., A Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jeannette Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Lakewood Eye Physicians and Surgeons, Inc., A Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less