This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 19:54:00 (UTC).

MARY LINDA SCOTT VS HAROLD GUZMAN MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 MARY LINDA SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAROLD GUZMAN MORALES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0826

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT MARY LINDA

Defendants

BUSTAMANTE MARIA

MORALES HAROLD GUZMAN

ORTEGA HUGO

RYDER TRUCK RENTAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALINAS ESQ. ARTURO T

Defendant Attorney

BURNS HAASTY S.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/5/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/8/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

7/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2023

8/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

8/28/2023: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/18/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/12/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Harold Guzman Morales (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/08/2023; Service Cost: 155.42; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ortega (Defendant); Service Date: 07/30/2023; Service Cost: 124.43; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 07/28/2023; Service Cost: 124.43; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Harold Guzman Morales (Defendant); Maria Bustamante (Defendant); Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Harold Guzman Morales (Defendant); Maria Bustamante (Defendant); Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mary Linda Scott (Plaintiff); As to: Harold Guzman Morales (Defendant); Maria Bustamante (Defendant); Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less