This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2023 at 08:24:18 (UTC).

LAVETA L. GRIBBLE, ET AL. VS BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 LAVETA L GRIBBLE, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1743

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRIBBLE GREGORY B.

GRIBBLE LAVETA L.

Defendants

BLOCK DRUG COMPANY INC.

BWDAC INC.

CARDIS CORPORATION

CHATTEM INC.

CHEVRON USA INC.

COTY INC.

DORSETT & JACKSON INC.

ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.

FOOTHILL AUTO MACHINE & SERVICE INC.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC. FKA AMMCO TOOLS INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIED SIGNAL INC. FKA BENDIX CORPORATION FKA BENDIX AVIATION CORP. FKA THE SIGNAL COMPANIES INC. FKA SIGNAL OIL & GAS COMPANY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

MAYBELLINE LLC

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER CORPORATION

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION FKA EIS BRAKES

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMELL DAVID L.

ORAL RABIAH N

Defendant Attorneys

COGGSHALL WILLIAM LAMAR

LEE FRED B.

SACHS MICHAEL B.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

6/23/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

6/23/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/23/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - DEFENDANT SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC.S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - DEFENDANT MAYBELLINE LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/20/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT MAYBELLINE LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Answer - DEFENDANT DORSETT & JACKSON, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM-ASBESTOS

6/20/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT DORSETT & JACKSON, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM-ASBESTOS

Answer

6/20/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketDefendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.S Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos; Filed by: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Defendant); As to: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); Gregory B. Gribble (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketDefendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.S Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketDefendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.S Demand for Jury Trial and Estimate of Length of Trial; Filed by: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- William Lamar Coggshall (Attorney): Organization Name changed from GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP to Grodon Reese Scully Mansukhani, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketAddress for William Lamar Coggshall (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/14/2023; Service Cost: 314.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Fred B. Lee (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP to GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hennessy Industries, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDefendant Maybelline LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by: Maybelline LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDefendant Dorsett & Jackson, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium-Asbestos; Filed by: Dorsett & Jackson, Inc. (Defendant); As to: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); Gregory B. Gribble (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet (Personal Injury Complaint); Filed by: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); As to: Block Drug Company, Inc. (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant); Cardis Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Demand for Jury and Posting of Advanced Jury Fees; Filed by: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); Gregory B. Gribble (Plaintiff); As to: Block Drug Company, Inc. (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant); Cardis Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); Gregory B. Gribble (Plaintiff); As to: Block Drug Company, Inc. (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant); Cardis Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LaVeta L. Gribble (Plaintiff); Gregory B. Gribble (Plaintiff); As to: Block Drug Company, Inc. (Defendant); BWDAC, Inc. (Defendant); Cardis Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less