This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 16:12:26 (UTC).

MIGUEL GUTIERREZ FUENTES VS AIR CONDITIONING SOLUTIONS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 MIGUEL GUTIERREZ FUENTES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AIR CONDITIONING SOLUTIONS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1930

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ FUENTES MIGUEL

Defendants

AIR CONDITIONING SOLUTIONS INC.

ALCALA JR. FELICIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOY MATTHEW KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

CARDWELL ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/3/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/3/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/3/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/3/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/3/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Demand for Jury Trial

6/16/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/16/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/15/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

8/31/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/6/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/09/2024

Hearing09/09/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2024

Hearing08/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2024

Hearing03/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Miguel Gutierrez Fuentes (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 03/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to 08/31/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
05/03/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miguel Gutierrez Fuentes (Plaintiff); As to: Air Conditioning Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Feliciano Alcala Jr. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Gutierrez Fuentes (Plaintiff); As to: Air Conditioning Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Feliciano Alcala Jr. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Miguel Gutierrez Fuentes (Plaintiff); As to: Air Conditioning Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Feliciano Alcala Jr. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less