This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 10:16:48 (UTC).

RICARDO ROJAS VS FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 RICARDO ROJAS filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1233

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROJAS RICARDO

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALLACE-TRACY DEANNA

MCGEE WILLIAM ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

SKANES MARK W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/26/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/26/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2024
  • Hearing04/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); As to: Ricardo Rojas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ricardo Rojas (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ricardo Rojas (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ricardo Rojas (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ricardo Rojas (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less