This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 16:50:54 (UTC).

GEORGE CIAMPA, ET AL. VS FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2023 GEORGE CIAMPA, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8905

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIAMPA GEORGE

STURTEVANT DOROTHY

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

JOHN CRANE INC.

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL FKA VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

REDCO CORPORATION FKA CRANE CO.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOLEY CRYSTAL G

Defendant Attorneys

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

GOODRICH CHRISTINA N.

MARTINOVICH EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Answer Redco Corporation’s (Formerly Known as Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiffs’ Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand

9/18/2023: Answer Redco Corporation’s (Formerly Known as Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiffs’ Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand

Answer Defendant John Crane Inc.’s Answer to Plaintiffs’ Complaint for Personal Injury– Asbestos

9/12/2023: Answer Defendant John Crane Inc.’s Answer to Plaintiffs’ Complaint for Personal Injury– Asbestos

Answer Defendant IMO Industries Inc.s Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury – Asbestos

8/30/2023: Answer Defendant IMO Industries Inc.s Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury – Asbestos

Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

8/30/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

8/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Notice (name extension) Notice of Order Assigning Case

8/18/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Order Assigning Case

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

8/10/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice (name extension) Preliminary Fact Sheet New Filing- Asbestos Litigation

8/10/2023: Notice (name extension) Preliminary Fact Sheet New Filing- Asbestos Litigation

Complaint

8/9/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/9/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2023

DocketRedco Corporations (Formerly Known as Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand; Filed by: RedCo Corporation (Defendant); As to: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketDefendant John Crane Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury Asbestos; Filed by: John Crane Inc. (Defendant); As to: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketDefendant IMO Industries Inc.s Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury Asbestos; Filed by: IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant); As to: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant); As to: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: RedCo Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: John Crane Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Industrial Holdings Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/15/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Paramount Global (Defendant); Service Date: 08/15/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/17/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
08/10/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet New Filing- Asbestos Litigation; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: George Ciampa (Plaintiff); Dorothy Sturtevant (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less