This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2023 at 00:50:14 (UTC).

VARGA, ZOLTAN JOSEF VS VARGA, TASSA

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 VARGA, ZOLTAN JOSEF filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against VARGA, TASSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GOULD-SALTMAN, DIANNA and KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0002

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GOULD-SALTMAN, DIANNA

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VARGA ZOLTAN JOSEF

Respondent

VARGA TASSA

Not Classified By Court

CASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WEISS CHANNA

Respondent Attorney

GANDHI BRINDA RAVI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/5/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/5/2023: Minute Order

Stipulation - Stipulation Receipt and Order Re Release of Civil Exhibits

7/5/2023: Stipulation - Stipulation Receipt and Order Re Release of Civil Exhibits

Miscellaneous - Settlement Agreement

7/5/2023: Miscellaneous - Settlement Agreement

Minute Order

6/30/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/29/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/28/2023: Minute Order

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

6/28/2023: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Response

6/9/2023: Response

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail - OP

6/8/2023: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail - OP

Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Electronic DA

6/8/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Electronic DA

Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Electronic OP

6/8/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Electronic OP

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

6/8/2023: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail DA

6/8/2023: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail DA

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/6/2023: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Electronic

6/2/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service - Electronic

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/2/2023: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/05/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 35, Gould-Saltman, Dianna, Presiding; Settlement Conference - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Settled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Settlement Agreement ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketStipulation (Stipulation Receipt and Order Re Release of Civil Exhibits ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/04/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/04/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/04/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/04/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
05/18/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: WARRANT IN LIEU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (RE: PETITION FOR RETURN OF MINOR CHILD TO PETITIONER UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND DECLARATION OF ROSA ALARCON ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: MEMORANDUM OF LAW: THE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION, DONE AT THE HAGUE, OCT. 25, 1980; -AND- THE INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION REMEDIES ACT, 22 U.S.C. 90001, ET. SEQ. ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EXPEDICTED PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECT OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: WARRANT IN LIEU OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (RE: PETITION FOR A WARRENT IN LIEU OF A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketNotice (RE: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR THE RETURN OF THE MINOR CHILD UNDER THE AGUE CONVENTION ON THE CIVIL ASPECTS OF INTERNATIONAL CHILD ABDUCTION ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less