This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2023 at 03:21:43 (UTC).

BELL-SCHNYDER , LISA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 BELL-SCHNYDER , LISA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9002

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHNYDER KYLE

Decedent

BELL-SCHNYDER LISA

Not Classified By Court

BETHEL STEPHEN K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DELANEY STEPHANIE KATHLEEN

GRECO DAVID GERALD

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

8/15/2023: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

8/15/2023: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Declaration Declaration in Support of Request to Waive Bond

8/15/2023: Declaration Declaration in Support of Request to Waive Bond

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

8/22/2023: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Service Proof of Service re Consents to E-Service for Kyle Schnyder & Lindsey Schnyder

9/7/2023: Proof of Service Proof of Service re Consents to E-Service for Kyle Schnyder & Lindsey Schnyder

Consent Consent to E-Service - Lindsey Schnyder

9/7/2023: Consent Consent to E-Service - Lindsey Schnyder

Consent Consent to E-Service - Kyle Schnyder

9/7/2023: Consent Consent to E-Service - Kyle Schnyder

Proof of Publication

9/12/2023: Proof of Publication

Supplement Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

10/23/2023: Supplement Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

Minute Order

10/31/2023: Minute Order

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

11/9/2023: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

04/01/2025

Hearing04/01/2025 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

Docketin Probate Department 11, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketPetition Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketSupplement (Supplement to Clear Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service re Consents to E-Service for Kyle Schnyder & Lindsey Schnyder ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketConsent (Consent to E-Service - Lindsey Schnyder ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketConsent (Consent to E-Service - Kyle Schnyder ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Support of Request to Waive Bond ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less