This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2023 at 06:50:19 (UTC).

TOUTLE LAKE SCHOOL DISTRICT VS META PLATFORMS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 TOUTLE LAKE SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against META PLATFORMS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2044

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOUTLE LAKE SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

BYTEDANCE INC.

FACEBOOK HOLDINGS LLC

FACEBOOK OPERATIONS LLC

GOOGLE LLC

INSTAGRAM LLC

META PAYMENTS INC.

META PLATFORMS INC.

META PLATFORMS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

SICULUS INC.

SNAP INC.

TIKTOK INC.

WHATSAPP INC.

YOUTUBE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINOFF WILLIAM BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

9/13/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/13/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/13/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 09/26/2023

9/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 09/26/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

9/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 12 - Hon. Carolyn B. Kuhl; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 09/26/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex ? Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Toutle Lake School District (Plaintiff); As to: Meta Platforms, Inc. (Defendant); Facebook Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Facebook Operations, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Toutle Lake School District (Plaintiff); As to: Meta Platforms, Inc. (Defendant); Facebook Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Facebook Operations, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Toutle Lake School District (Plaintiff); As to: Meta Platforms, Inc. (Defendant); Facebook Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Facebook Operations, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less