*******1653
05/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
GOWETT SHIRLEY
AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.
DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE
DOLIN TIONNA GRACE
SUAREZ JEANETTE
5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM
5/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
5/24/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS JURY TRIAL DEMANDED
6/1/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
6/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service
6/27/2023: Answer
Hearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement
[-] Read LessHearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Defendant); As to: Shirley Gowett (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Shirley Gowett (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; Filed by: Shirley Gowett (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Shirley Gowett (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Shirley Gowett (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Defendant); DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)
[-] Read Less