This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 17:16:37 (UTC).

HAING KYUN NA VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 HAING KYUN NA filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3105

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NA HAING KYUN

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE DAVID

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/19/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet and Coversheet Addendum

9/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet and Coversheet Addendum

Complaint COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT 2. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY UNDER THE SONG BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/19/2023: Complaint COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT 2. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY UNDER THE SONG BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/19/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/19/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

04/09/2024

Hearing04/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Haing Kyun Na (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketAddress for David Lee (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY UNDER THE SONG-BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT 2. BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY UNDER THE SONG BEVERLY WARRANTY ACT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: Haing Kyun Na (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Coversheet Addendum; Filed by: Haing Kyun Na (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Haing Kyun Na (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less