This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 07:37:46 (UTC).

LAURA PONCE VS FCA US, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 LAURA PONCE filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2815

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PONCE LAURA

Defendant

FCA US LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASHANI JACOB KAHEN

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN E.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/20/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

9/20/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/20/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/20/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/20/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer Answer DEFENDANT FCA US LLC’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/30/2023: Answer Answer DEFENDANT FCA US LLC’S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

01/04/2024

Hearing01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketAnswer DEFENDANT FCA US LLC?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed by: FCA US, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: LAURA PONCE (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketAddress for Jacob Kahen Kashani (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LAURA PONCE (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/22/2023; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: LAURA PONCE (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LAURA PONCE (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LAURA PONCE (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less