This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2023 at 02:36:41 (UTC).

CHARLY ESTUARDO PAUL CRUZ VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 CHARLY ESTUARDO PAUL CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4587

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ CHARLY ESTUARDO PAUL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BROWN BRANDON

HENG SOKUN

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

TEANG SOK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERMAN MITCHELL EVAN

Defendant Attorneys

ALLEN PHILIP CHANDLER

PASCOE WILLIAM T.

ALLEN PHILLIP C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/2/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

3/2/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

3/2/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/2/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/2/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/12/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

5/3/2023: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

5/3/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/3/2023: Answer

Answer

5/8/2023: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2025
  • Hearing02/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2024
  • Hearing08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2024
  • Hearing08/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sok Teang (Defendant); As to: Charly Estuardo Paul Cruz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAddress for Phillip C. Allen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); As to: Sok Teang (Defendant); Sokun Heng (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); As to: Sok Teang (Defendant); Sokun Heng (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); As to: Charly Estuardo Paul Cruz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Charly Estuardo Paul Cruz (Plaintiff); As to: Brandon Brown (Defendant); Service Date: 04/11/2023; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/27/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Charly Estuardo Paul Cruz (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Brandon Brown (Defendant); Sok Teang (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Charly Estuardo Paul Cruz (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant); Brandon Brown (Defendant); Sok Teang (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less