This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2023 at 09:19:00 (UTC).

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP. VS KAI'S HOSPITALITY LA LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 NAVITAS CREDIT CORP filed an Other lawsuit against KAI'S HOSPITALITY LA LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2050

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVITAS CREDIT CORP.

Defendants

KAI'S HOSPITALITY LA LLC DBA KAI'S TABLE

LEE NORMAN KAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNS BARRY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARRY W. FERNS

8/17/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BARRY W. FERNS

Summary of the Case

8/17/2023: Summary of the Case

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/17/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST

8/17/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE ACCRUED INTEREST

Request for Dismissal

8/17/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

8/17/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/8/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/12/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/12/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/10/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/10/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/10/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Navitas Credit Corp. on 05/10/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Navitas Credit Corp., does *As to DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Kai's Hospitality LA LLC (Defendant); Norman Kai Lee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration re Accrued Interest; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Barry W. Ferns; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Norman Kai Lee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Kai's Hospitality LA LLC (Defendant); Norman Kai Lee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Navitas Credit Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Kai's Hospitality LA LLC (Defendant); Norman Kai Lee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less