This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 23:48:34 (UTC).

ROBERTO ARMANDO AYON VS ALTO OPERATIONS CALIFORNIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 ROBERTO ARMANDO AYON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALTO OPERATIONS CALIFORNIA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are UPINDER S. KALRA and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9843

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

UPINDER S. KALRA

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYON ROBERTO ARMANDO

Defendant

ALTO OPERATIONS CALIFORNIA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES R.

Defendant Attorney

MCCOY RYAN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

9/6/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Related Case

9/6/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

9/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Case Management Statement

8/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/25/2023

8/25/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/25/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

8/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Answer

8/22/2023: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/21/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request - REQUEST AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/21/2023: Request - REQUEST AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

8/21/2023: Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/2/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/2/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/2/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • Hearing10/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 23STCV09843, 22STCV12545 are related; case number 22STCV12545 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 23STCV04241, 23STCV09843 are related; case number 23STCV04241 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Initial Status Conference Order: Result Date: 09/21/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 17 - Hon. Maren Nelson; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of 09/21/2023, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 51 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROBERTO ARMANDO AYON (Plaintiff); As to: ALTO OPERATIONS CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROBERTO ARMANDO AYON (Plaintiff); As to: ALTO OPERATIONS CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROBERTO ARMANDO AYON (Plaintiff); As to: ALTO OPERATIONS CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less