This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 15:07:15 (UTC).

MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1116

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ MARCO

SANCHEZ LOPEZ BLASA

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/17/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

4/17/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/19/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/19/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2023
  • Hearing09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • Hearing09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); BLASA SANCHEZ LOPEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); BLASA SANCHEZ LOPEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 04/20/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department G Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); BLASA SANCHEZ LOPEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); BLASA SANCHEZ LOPEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); BLASA SANCHEZ LOPEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARCO HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); BLASA SANCHEZ LOPEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less