This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2023 at 00:54:55 (UTC).

LILIAN MARIBEL ROSARIO ORDONEZ, ET AL. VS ANGEL JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 LILIAN MARIBEL ROSARIO ORDONEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANGEL JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3426

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

ROSARIO ORDONEZ LILIAN MARIBEL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

JIMENEZ ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELLOSO DULCE C.

CHAMPION KIA SHAMLOO

Defendant Attorney

VALLEJO MATTHEW J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2023: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

10/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Summons Summons on Cross-Complaint

9/12/2023: Summons Summons on Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

9/12/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/15/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

9/12/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/12/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/11/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/8/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/8/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/7/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/7/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez, et al. on 08/07/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez, Andrew Torres, and Steven Torres as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez (Plaintiff); Andrew Torres (Plaintiff); Steven Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Jimenez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Angel Jimenez (Cross-Complainant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Matthew J. Vallejo (Attorney): First Name changed from J. Dean to Matthew; Last Name changed from Rice to Vallejo; Middle Name: J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketAddress for Matthew J. Vallejo (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Matthew J. Vallejo (Attorney): Organization Name: Bretoi, Lutz & Stele

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez (Plaintiff) to Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Summons on Cross-Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Cross-Complaint ; As To Parties changed from Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez (Plaintiff) to Lilian Maribel Rosario Ordonez (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
08/08/2023

DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Lilian Maribeel Rosario Ordonez (Plaintiff),Steven Torres (Plaintiff),Andrew Torres (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 08/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lilian Maribeel Rosario Ordonez (Plaintiff); Andrew Torres (Plaintiff); Steven Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Jimenez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lilian Maribeel Rosario Ordonez (Plaintiff); Andrew Torres (Plaintiff); Steven Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Jimenez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 08/08/2023 to 08/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 08/08/2023 to 08/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less