This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 02:25:07 (UTC).

STEFANIE NICOLE PALLAN VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 STEFANIE NICOLE PALLAN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2920

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALLAN STEFANIE NICOLE

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORROW III NEAL F. F. III

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/14/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/14/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/14/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2024

Hearing01/19/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: STEFANIE NICOLE PALLAN (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/18/2023; Service Cost: 163.99; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: STEFANIE NICOLE PALLAN (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STEFANIE NICOLE PALLAN (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STEFANIE NICOLE PALLAN (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less