This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 00:54:10 (UTC).

PIAZZA FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 PIAZZA FAMILY RESTAURANTS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1599

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIAZZA FAMILY RESTAURANTS INC.

Defendants

HOT LINE CONSTRUCTION INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOZINGO GLEN R.

Defendant Attorneys

STANLEY JAMES G

HICKERSON ANEIKO L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

7/20/2023: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

7/20/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

7/20/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice - NOTICE OF ADDRESSES FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

7/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ADDRESSES FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Answer

7/3/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

6/26/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/23/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/23/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2023
  • Hearing09/21/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Piazza Family Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Hot Line Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company Erroneously Sued As Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant); As to: Piazza Family Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Posting of Jury Fees: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Piazza Family Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Hot Line Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Piazza Family Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Hot Line Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Piazza Family Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Hot Line Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less