This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2023 at 08:32:17 (UTC).

CRISTAL L. MORAN VS THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 CRISTAL L MORAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6079

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORAN CRISTAL L.

Defendants

BARNES TED

MAGNOLIA ALLYNN

PATLAN KARINA

REYES RUDY

SALCIDO ANGEL

THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO. DBA THORSON MOTOR CENTER A CORPORATION

LORETO JOSE ALBERTO

MELENDES HECTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERMECHI BABAK

Defendant Attorneys

ENEMUOH CHIAMAKA S.

SCALI CHRISTIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/13/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/6/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

7/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT THORSON GMC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/3/2023: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT THORSON GMC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/27/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BABAK TERMECHI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/27/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BABAK TERMECHI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/27/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/2/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/2/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/2/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/2/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHIAMAKA S. ENEMUOH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TED BARNES; ANGEL SALCIDO; KARINA PATLAN; ALLYNN MAGNOLIA; RUDY REYES DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/2/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cristal L. Moran (Plaintiff); As to: Hector Melendes (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/12/2023; Service Cost: 123.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Allynn Magnolia (Defendant): First Name changed from ALLYNN to Allynn; Last Name changed from MAGNOLIA to Magnolia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Rudy Reyes (Defendant): First Name changed from RUDY to Rudy; Last Name changed from REYES to Reyes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CRISTAL L. MORAN (Plaintiff); As to: THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO., a corporation (Defendant); TED BARNES (Defendant); ANGEL SALCIDO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CRISTAL L. MORAN (Plaintiff); As to: THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO., a corporation (Defendant); TED BARNES (Defendant); ANGEL SALCIDO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CRISTAL L. MORAN (Plaintiff); As to: THORSON GMC TRUCK-BUICK MOTOR CO., a corporation (Defendant); TED BARNES (Defendant); ANGEL SALCIDO (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less