This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 08:21:33 (UTC).

BRIAN WHITAKER VS KEBAB BAR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 BRIAN WHITAKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against KEBAB BAR, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1605

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITAKER BRIAN

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

KEBAB BAR A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER MARK DEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint - VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF: UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT; CALIFORNIA DISABLED PERSONS ACT

5/19/2023: Complaint - VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF: UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT; CALIFORNIA DISABLED PERSONS ACT

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

5/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/19/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/19/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/19/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

5/30/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2024
  • Hearing01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketVerified Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief for Violations of: Unruh Civil Rights Act; California Disabled Persons Act; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Kebab Bar, a California Corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Kebab Bar, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Kebab Bar, a California Corporation (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less