This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2023 at 14:21:19 (UTC).

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION VS RAUL GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 WESTERN SURETY COMPANY, A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAUL GONZALEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0969

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Defendants

GONZALEZ RAUL

LUTTRELL KATIANA

RSC CONSTRUCTION INC.

CURIEL TERESA ESA DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD ELMIRA R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint in Interpleader

5/16/2023: Complaint in Interpleader

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/16/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/16/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/16/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/16/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/16/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/16/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/27/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/29/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/28/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/31/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Gonzalez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff); As to: Teresa Curiel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/02/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff); As to: Katiana Luttrell (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Western Surety Company (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Western Surety Company, a South Dakota Corporation to Western Surety Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Raul Gonzalez (Defendant): Last Name changed from Gonzalez, an individual to Gonzalez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Katiana Luttrell (Defendant): Last Name changed from Luttrell, an individual to Luttrell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for Elmira R. Howard (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Gonzalez, an individual (Defendant); Katiana Luttrell, an individual (Defendant); RSC Construction Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Gonzalez, an individual (Defendant); Katiana Luttrell, an individual (Defendant); RSC Construction Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Western Surety Company, a South Dakota Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Gonzalez, an individual (Defendant); Katiana Luttrell, an individual (Defendant); RSC Construction Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less