This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2023 at 13:53:30 (UTC).

ALICIA S. MCDONALD VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 ALICIA S MCDONALD filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1539

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDONALD ALICIA S.

Defendants

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

DOE MARIA

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

SAFEWAY INC.

THE VONS COMPANIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOMEZ CARLOS ALBERTO

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/15/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/15/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/15/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/15/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2023
  • Hearing11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/22/2023; Service Cost: 129.61; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/22/2023; Service Cost: 70.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/22/2023; Service Cost: 70.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant), ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant), SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant), MARIA DOE (Defendant) to MARIA DOE (Defendant), ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant), SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant), THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alicia S. McDonald (Plaintiff); As to: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); THE VONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant); SAFEWAY, INC. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less