This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 20:07:31 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2023 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1180

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

HARBOR REAL ESTATE L.P.

REXEL USA INC.

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY

ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

MARINA WATERSIDE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARTWICK JEFFREY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/1/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/1/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/1/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF PROCEEDING

9/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF PROCEEDING

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

12/06/2023

Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- Jeffrey A. Hartwick (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Andrew to A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketAddress for Jeffrey A. Hartwick (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- The People of the State of California (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation to The People of the State of California

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- County of Los Angeles (Defendant): Organization Name changed from COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES to County of Los Angeles

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- Marina Waterside, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from MARINA WATERSIDE, LLC; a California limited liability company to Marina Waterside, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- City of Los Angeles (Defendant): Organization Name changed from CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation to City of Los Angeles

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America (Defendant): Organization Name changed from ALLIANZ LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, a Minnesota corporation to Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
09/06/2023

DocketUpdated -- Harbor Real Estate L.P. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from HARBOR REAL ESTATE L.P. to Harbor Real Estate L.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketNotice Notice of Pendency of Proceeding; Filed by: The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); MARINA WATERSIDE, LLC; a California limited liability company (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); MARINA WATERSIDE, LLC; a California limited liability company (Defendant); CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a municipal corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less