This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 09:53:26 (UTC).

JAVIER ARIAS WIDDY VS WANSHIP ENTERPRISES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 JAVIER ARIAS WIDDY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WANSHIP ENTERPRISES, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1574

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WIDDY JAVIER ARIAS

Defendants

SAINSBURY GUY LAWRENCE III

WANSHIP ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOY MATTHEW KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/31/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Javier Arias Widdy (Plaintiff); As to: Wanship Enterprises, LLC (Defendant); Guy Lawrence Sainsbury, III (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Javier Arias Widdy (Plaintiff); As to: Wanship Enterprises, LLC (Defendant); Guy Lawrence Sainsbury, III (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Javier Arias Widdy (Plaintiff); As to: Wanship Enterprises, LLC (Defendant); Guy Lawrence Sainsbury, III (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department G Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less