This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2023 at 09:02:30 (UTC).

ANDREW LOGAN MARTINEZ VS WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 ANDREW LOGAN MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5516

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ANDREW LOGAN

Defendants

WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

SARMENTO TINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN ARIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/13/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

3/13/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

3/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/13/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

3/13/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/4/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 07/11/2023

7/11/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 07/11/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

7/11/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Proof of Service - No Service

10/26/2023: Proof of Service - No Service

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plainti...) of 10/30/2023

10/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plainti...) of 10/30/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plainti...)

10/30/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plainti...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/1/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2024

Hearing01/19/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 31 - Hon. Kerry Bensingereffective 11/06/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plainti...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plainti...) of 10/30/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/19/2024 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: sanctions against counsel for plaintiff in the amount of $500 for Failure to Appear and Failure to File Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Andrew Logan Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Wireless Advocates, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference): Status Date changed from 07/11/2023 to 07/11/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Case Management Conference) to (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
03/14/2023

DocketAddress for Arie Ebrahimian (Attorney) null

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANDREW LOGAN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC, a Washington corporation (Defendant); TINA SARMIENTO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANDREW LOGAN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC, a Washington corporation (Defendant); TINA SARMIENTO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANDREW LOGAN MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); As to: WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC, a Washington corporation (Defendant); TINA SARMIENTO (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less