This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2023 at 03:32:25 (UTC).

SHAWN STERN, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 SHAWN STERN, filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1080

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALBERT STERN BY AND THROUGH HIS CONSERVATOR SHAWN STERN

STERN PATRICIA

STERN SHAWN

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATERS GREGORY P.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

10/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

8/22/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

7/3/2023: Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/26/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

6/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Order (name extension) Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

6/23/2023: Order (name extension) Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

Notice (name extension) Notice OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL’S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

6/8/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL’S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

6/6/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/6/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Re: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Re: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Notice of Related Case

5/19/2023: Notice of Related Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/16/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/11/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2023

Hearing11/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...): Status Date changed from 10/23/2023 to 10/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/22/2023 01:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketNotice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL, a California Corporation (Defendant); JCCP Number: JCCP5000

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketUpdated -- John Hueston (Attorney): Middle Name: blank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
05/12/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret L. Oldendorf in Department P Pasadena Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHAWN STERN (Plaintiff); ALBERT STERN, by and through his conservator, SHAWN STERN (Plaintiff); PATRICIA STERN (Plaintiff); Shawn Stern (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: SHAWN STERN (Plaintiff); ALBERT STERN, by and through his conservator, SHAWN STERN (Plaintiff); PATRICIA STERN (Plaintiff); Shawn Stern (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); EDISON INTERNATIONAL, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less