This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 07:25:49 (UTC).

JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN VS JAIME ANTONIO SORIANO COLINDRES

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAIME ANTONIO SORIANO COLINDRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1498

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KILLIAN JOSHUA JAMES

Defendant

SORIANO COLINDRES JAIME ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BELLOSO DULCE C.

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/5/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

7/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/31/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME ANTONIO SORIANO COLINDRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME ANTONIO SORIANO COLINDRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME ANTONIO SORIANO COLINDRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOSHUA JAMES KILLIAN (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME ANTONIO SORIANO COLINDRES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less