This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 20:19:58 (UTC).

STEPHANIE THOMPSON VS CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

Case Summary

On 03/28/2023 STEPHANIE THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, LAWRENCE P. RIFF and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6831

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON STEPHANIE

Defendant

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIEN RACHEL MEGAN

LLP OLIVIER & SCHREIBER

Defendant Attorneys

GERST SARAH E.

BROCHARD KYLE H.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

9/11/2023: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/22/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Initial Status Conference Order

8/18/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/18/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

8/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 08/18/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

8/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

8/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 08/18/2023

8/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 08/18/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/14/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/31/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/25/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/10/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/10/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Case Management Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/30/2023: Case Management Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 3:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Stephanie Thompson (Plaintiff); City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Stephanie Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 7 - Hon. Lawrence P. Riff; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Case Reassignment;) of 08/18/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Case Reassignment;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case) of 08/18/2023, Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stephanie Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stephanie Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stephanie Thompson (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less