This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 23:32:18 (UTC).

FREDDY ALBERTO RONDON VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 FREDDY ALBERTO RONDON filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1702

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONDON FREDDY ALBERTO

Defendants

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOE 1 AN ENTITY UNKNOWN FORM DBA VALLEY-HI HONDA

DOES 2 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY 2. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY 3. VIOLATION OF THE SONG- BEVERLY ACT SECTION 1793.2 4

5/30/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY 2. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY 3. VIOLATION OF THE SONG- BEVERLY ACT SECTION 1793.2 4

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

5/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/30/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/30/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

6/8/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

7/17/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED

Answer - DEFENDANT DAV, INC. D/B/A VALLEY-HI HONDAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/11/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT DAV, INC. D/B/A VALLEY-HI HONDAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/31/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); DOE 1, an entity unknown form (Defendant); DOES 2 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT DAV, INC. D/B/A VALLEY-HI HONDAS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed by: DOE 1, an entity unknown form (Defendant); As to: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, an entity unknown form (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/28/2023; Service Cost: 82.60; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 06/16/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); DOE 1, an entity unknown form (Defendant); DOES 2 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY 2. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY 3. VIOLATION OF THE SONG- BEVERLY ACT SECTION 1793.2 4. NEGLIGENT REPAIR; Filed by: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); DOE 1, an entity unknown form (Defendant); DOES 2 through 10, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Freddy Alberto Rondon (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); DOE 1, an entity unknown form (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less