This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 15:31:01 (UTC).

CARLOS ORNELAS VS CHRISTEN LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 CARLOS ORNELAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTEN LOPEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1755

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORNELAS CARLOS

Defendants

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO.

LOPEZ CHRISTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAMB JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/24/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/24/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2025
  • Hearing05/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2024
  • Hearing11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2024
  • Hearing11/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carlos Ornelas (Plaintiff); As to: Christen Lopez (Defendant); American Honda Motor Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa R. Jaskol in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carlos Ornelas (Plaintiff); As to: Christen Lopez (Defendant); American Honda Motor Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less