This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2023 at 00:21:04 (UTC).

AGNES ESTHER BUTLER VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 AGNES ESTHER BUTLER filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1842

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTLER AGNES ESTHER

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM M.

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/27/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2023
  • Hearing09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Agnes Esther Butler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Agnes Esther Butler (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/26/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAddress for Adam M. Zolonz (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Agnes Esther Butler (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Agnes Esther Butler (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Agnes Esther Butler (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 24 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less