This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 02:19:06 (UTC).

BRITTNEY MCCOY VS LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2023 BRITTNEY MCCOY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7572

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCOY BRITTNEY

Defendants

GUTIERREZ YVONNE

LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE

LONG BEACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEMIRJIAN ARMAN

KESHISHYAN ROMINA

Defendant Attorney

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...)

9/21/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...)

Case Management Statement

9/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Katti E. Trinh Re OSC Re Failure to Appear

9/6/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Katti E. Trinh Re OSC Re Failure to Appear

Notice of Ruling

9/1/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

9/1/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

8/18/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

5/22/2023: Answer

Notice (name extension) Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

5/22/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

4/13/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

4/5/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

4/5/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/24/2025

Hearing03/24/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2025

Hearing03/14/2025 at 09:00 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2024

Hearing11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/24/2025 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2025 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 updated: Result Date to 09/21/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount of $500 Pursuant to CCP Section 177.5 Against Counsel for the Defendants for Failing to Appear at the Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 updated: Result Date to 09/21/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketDeclaration of Katti E. Trinh Re OSC Re Failure to Appear; Filed by: Long Beach City College Erroneously Sued As Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
04/07/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael Small in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brittney McCoy (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach City College (Defendant); Long Beach Community College District (Defendant); Yvonne Gutierrez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brittney McCoy (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach City College (Defendant); Long Beach Community College District (Defendant); Yvonne Gutierrez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brittney McCoy (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach City College (Defendant); Long Beach Community College District (Defendant); Yvonne Gutierrez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less