This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 11:18:36 (UTC).

PAUL FRONDARINA VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 PAUL FRONDARINA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0380

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRONDARINA PAUL

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/6/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/6/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/6/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/6/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN KAY PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN KAY PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Ryan Kay Pursuant to CCP Section 430.41 in Response to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint: Name Extension: of Ryan Kay Pursuant to CCP Section 430.41 in Response to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint ; Document changed from Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension to Declaration (name extension) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Ryan Kay Pursuant to CCP Section 430.41 in Response to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PAUL FRONDARINA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant); Service Date: 04/06/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PAUL FRONDARINA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PAUL FRONDARINA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PAUL FRONDARINA (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less