This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2023 at 19:15:09 (UTC).

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES, LLC VS ANAHEIM & WALNUT HOUSING, LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 FERGUSON ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANAHEIM WALNUT HOUSING, LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1494

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

Defendants

ANAHEIM & WALNUT HOUSING LP A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

THE CITY OF LONG BEACH A PUBLIC ENTITY

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AKA US BANCORP NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYKULSKI DANA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/7/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/7/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/7/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/8/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/8/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

8/21/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC on 08/07/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ferguson Enterprises, LLC as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Anaheim & Walnut Housing, LP, a limited partnership (Defendant); The City of Long Beach, a public entity (Defendant); US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Anaheim & Walnut Housing, LP, a limited partnership (Defendant); The City of Long Beach, a public entity (Defendant); US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Anaheim & Walnut Housing, LP, a limited partnership (Defendant); The City of Long Beach, a public entity (Defendant); US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Anaheim & Walnut Housing, LP, a limited partnership (Defendant); The City of Long Beach, a public entity (Defendant); US Bank, National Association (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less