This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 03:24:55 (UTC).

JAMES CHADWICK LYON VS DIGNITY HEALTH, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2023 JAMES CHADWICK LYON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3852

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYON JAMES CHADWICK

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH

DIGNITY HEALTH

MELEEO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDELL JOHNNY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/14/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

6/14/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

6/14/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

6/14/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/16/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/28/2023

9/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/28/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

9/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Settlement

9/28/2023: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by James Chadwick Lyon on 06/14/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by James Chadwick Lyon as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: James Chadwick Lyon (Plaintiff); As to: Dignity Health (Defendant); CommonSpirit Health (Defendant); Meleeo, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: James Chadwick Lyon (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/28/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 71 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
06/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- California Hospital Medical Center (Defendant): Organization Name changed from California Hospital Medical Center, a business entity form unknow, a corporation to California Hospital Medical Center

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 71

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: James Chadwick Lyon (Plaintiff); As to: Dignity Health, a corporation (Defendant); CommonSpirit Health, a corporation (Defendant); Meleeo, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: James Chadwick Lyon (Plaintiff); As to: Dignity Health, a corporation (Defendant); CommonSpirit Health, a corporation (Defendant); Meleeo, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: James Chadwick Lyon (Plaintiff); As to: Dignity Health, a corporation (Defendant); CommonSpirit Health, a corporation (Defendant); Meleeo, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less