This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 07:01:39 (UTC).

AYRAPET KYUREGYAN, ET AL. VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 AYRAPET KYUREGYAN, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1523

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KYUREGYAN AYRAPET

PLS ENTERPRISES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RYDELL AUTOMOTIVE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/29/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/28/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2024
  • Hearing03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rydell Automotive Group, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); As to: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); PLS Enterprises, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); PLS Enterprises, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Rydell Automotive Group, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/26/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); PLS Enterprises, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); PLS Enterprises, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Rydell Automotive Group, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); PLS Enterprises, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Rydell Automotive Group, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ayrapet Kyuregyan (Plaintiff); PLS Enterprises, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Rydell Automotive Group, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less