This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 10:00:57 (UTC).

SANDY CASTILLO N E CARDONA SANTILLAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2023 SANDY CASTILLO N E CARDONA SANTILLAN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC , A MARYLAND CORPORATION ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6792

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO N E SANTILLAN SANDY

Defendants

ANDERSON STEVE DBA PROGRESSIVE INSULATION & WINDOWS;

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAUER RACHAEL

SIEGEL ELLIOT J.

 

Court Documents

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/18/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/18/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/18/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/19/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/19/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Case for 90 Days to Allow for Mediation and Settlement and to Continua all Related Dates, Including the Deadline for a Petition to Compel Arbitr

8/16/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Case for 90 Days to Allow for Mediation and Settlement and to Continua all Related Dates, Including the Deadline for a Petition to Compel Arbitration

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sandy Castillo n e Cardona Santillan, an individual on 07/18/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sandy Castillo n e Santillan as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sandy Castillo n e Santillan (Plaintiff); As to: Barrett Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Steve Anderson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Sandy Castillo n e Santillan (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/28/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/28/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Case for 90 Days to Allow for Mediation and Settlement and to Continua all Related Dates, Including the Deadline for a Petition to Compel Arbitration; Signed and Filed by: Sandy Castillo ne Santillan (Plaintiff); As to: Barrett Business Services, Inc. (Defendant); Steve Anderson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Case for 90 Days to Allow for Mediation and Settlement and to Continua all Related Dates, Including the Deadline for a Petition to Compel Arbitration: Filed By: Sandy Castillo ne Santillan (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 08/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
07/19/2023

DocketAddress for Rachael Sauer (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sandy Castillo ne Cardona Santillan, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Barrett Business Services, Inc., a Maryland corporation; (Defendant); Steve Anderson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sandy Castillo ne Cardona Santillan, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Barrett Business Services, Inc., a Maryland corporation; (Defendant); Steve Anderson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sandy Castillo ne Cardona Santillan, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Barrett Business Services, Inc., a Maryland corporation; (Defendant); Steve Anderson (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less