This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 05:39:23 (UTC).

VICTOR FARIAS VS MURRAY PLUMBING AND HEATING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 VICTOR FARIAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MURRAY PLUMBING AND HEATING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8843

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARIAS VICTOR

Defendants

DOE JUSTIN

MURRAY PLUMBING AND HEATING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPELES KEVIN A.

Defendant Attorneys

CROWLEY LISA RENE

SAXON BRANDON DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/21/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/21/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/21/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/21/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LISA R. CROWLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OF DEMURRER TO COUNTS TWO, THREE, AND FIVE OF THE COMPLAINT

6/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LISA R. CROWLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OF DEMURRER TO COUNTS TWO, THREE, AND FIVE OF THE COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/14/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/14/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

8/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/22/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

8/22/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

8/22/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2024
  • Hearing02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2024
  • Hearing02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Victor Farias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Murray Plumbing And Heating Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Murray Plumbing And Heating Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Victor Farias (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/08/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Victor Farias (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Murray Plumbing And Heating Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kevin A. Lipeles (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Victor Farias (Plaintiff); As to: Murray Plumbing And Heating Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Justin Doe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Victor Farias (Plaintiff); As to: Murray Plumbing And Heating Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Justin Doe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Victor Farias (Plaintiff); As to: Murray Plumbing And Heating Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Justin Doe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 48 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less