This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2023 at 07:59:52 (UTC).

MARILYN DANIELS VS FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 MARILYN DANIELS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2330

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS MARILYN

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION FKA THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

JOHN CRANE INC.

PARAMOUNT GLOBAL FKA VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

REDCO CORPORATION FKA CRANE CO.

SOCO WEST INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOLEY CRYSTAL G

Defendant Attorneys

WEGLARZ CLAIRE C.

MARTINOVICH EDWARD

PITT DAMON M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

9/11/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Answer Redco Corporation’s (Formerly Known As Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand

8/9/2023: Answer Redco Corporation’s (Formerly Known As Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Plaintiff’s Notice of Posting Jury Fees

8/4/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Plaintiff’s Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer Defendant John Crane Inc.’s Answer to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action

7/13/2023: Answer Defendant John Crane Inc.’s Answer to Plaintiff’s First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice Of Order Assigning Case

7/6/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice Of Order Assigning Case

Answer Defendant IMO Industries Inc.’s Answer to Complaint for Survival Action

6/22/2023: Answer Defendant IMO Industries Inc.’s Answer to Complaint for Survival Action

Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

6/22/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

6/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

6/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

6/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

6/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

6/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service Proof of Service of Summons

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/09/2024

Hearing12/09/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2024

Hearing11/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2024

Hearing06/12/2024 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Marilyn Daniels on 05/31/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Marilyn Daniels as to Union Carbide Corporation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
06/06/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: Soco West, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Marilyn Daniels on 05/31/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Marilyn Daniels as to Soco West, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); Industrial Holdings Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); Industrial Holdings Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); Industrial Holdings Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketNotice PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET; Filed by: Marilyn Daniels (Plaintiff); As to: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Defendant); General Electric Company (Defendant); Industrial Holdings Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less