This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 04:22:31 (UTC).

JEFFREY FADER VS CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 JEFFREY FADER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9206

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FADER JEFFREY

Defendant

CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHEIDEMANTLE DAVID R.

Defendant Attorney

HOLLINS ANDREW STEWART

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/9/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HENDLER FAYNE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEMURRERS AND

7/5/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE RE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HENDLER FAYNE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEMURRERS AND

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS

6/30/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

6/30/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HENDLER FAYNE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HENDLER FAYNE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HENDLER FAYNE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HENDLER FAYNE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice - NOTICE OF AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/15/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRETT A. BOON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRETT A. BOON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/25/2023: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2024
  • Hearing07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation to Stay Action and [Proposed] Order: Filed By: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to Stay Action and [Proposed] Order; Signed and Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); As to: Crusader Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketNotice Amended Proof of Service re Plaintiff's Oppositions to Demurrers and Motion to Strike and Declaration of Katherine Hendler Fayne in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositions to Demurrers and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); As to: Crusader Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketOpposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrers; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Katherine Hendler Fayne in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendant's Demurrers and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketOpposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); As to: Crusader Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 139.20; Proof of Mailing Date: 05/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketAddress for David R. Scheidemantle (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); As to: Crusader Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); As to: Crusader Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jeffrey Fader (Plaintiff); As to: Crusader Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less