This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 01:01:28 (UTC).

HIRAM RADAI DELGADO PENA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ACE HARDWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 HIRAM RADAI DELGADO PENA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACE HARDWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2347

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELGADO PENA AN INDIVIDUAL HIRAM RADAI

Defendants

ACE HARDWARE CORPORATION

SMITH AN INDIVIDUAL JOSHUA JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISON OWILI K.

Defendant Attorney

BURNETT SEAN R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/26/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

7/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

7/26/2023: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ace Hardware Corporation (Defendant); Joshua James Smith, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of default scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/12/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Hiram Radai Delgado Pena, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Hiram Radai Delgado Pena, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hiram Radai Delgado Pena, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua James Smith, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/05/2023; Service Cost: 451.41; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Owili K. Eison (Attorney): Organization Name changed from BD&J, P.C. to BD&J, P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAddress for Owili K. Eison (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hiram Radai Delgado Pena, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Hardware Corporation (Defendant); Joshua James Smith, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hiram Radai Delgado Pena, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Ace Hardware Corporation (Defendant); Joshua James Smith, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less