This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 09:54:49 (UTC).

KAYLIE JOY YOON VS ADIB JAZBANI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 KAYLIE JOY YOON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADIB JAZBANI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HUEY P. COTTON and SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1664

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HUEY P. COTTON

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOON KAYLIE JOY

Defendants

ALZAATREH NASSIM

JAZBANI ADIB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/17/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

8/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/8/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Related Case

8/9/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/31/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)) OF 09/05/2023

9/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)) OF 09/05/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE))

9/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2023

Hearing11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCase Management Conference (W/Related 23VECV01662) scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department T - Hon. Shirley K. Watkins

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase numbers 23VECV01662, 23VECV01664 are related; case number 23VECV01662 is the lead case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order (Re: Notice of Related Case))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order (Re: Notice of Related Case)) of 09/05/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kaylie Joy Yoon (Plaintiff); As to: Adib Jazbani (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/22/2023; Service Cost: 133.64; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
04/18/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kaylie Joy Yoon (Plaintiff); As to: Adib Jazbani (Defendant); Nassim Alzaatreh (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kaylie Joy Yoon (Plaintiff); As to: Adib Jazbani (Defendant); Nassim Alzaatreh (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kaylie Joy Yoon (Plaintiff); As to: Adib Jazbani (Defendant); Nassim Alzaatreh (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less