This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 05:55:37 (UTC).

MIRANDA, MARINA ARIAS VS VASQUEZ MORENO, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 MIRANDA, MARINA ARIAS filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against VASQUEZ MORENO, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MIRANDA MARINA ARIAS

Respondent

VASQUEZ MORENO JOSE LUIS

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous - Re: Petitioner For A Warrant In Lieu Of A Writ Of Habeas Corpus

5/22/2023: Miscellaneous - Re: Petitioner For A Warrant In Lieu Of A Writ Of Habeas Corpus

Miscellaneous - Re: Memorandum Of Law: The Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- The International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22

5/22/2023: Miscellaneous - Re: Memorandum Of Law: The Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- The International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22

Notice - Re: Notice of Application For Access To The Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspect Of international Child Abduction

5/22/2023: Notice - Re: Notice of Application For Access To The Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspect Of international Child Abduction

Miscellaneous - Re: Points and Authorities In Support Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspect of International Child Abduction

5/22/2023: Miscellaneous - Re: Points and Authorities In Support Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspect of International Child Abduction

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - Re: Petition For Access To Minor Child To Petitioner Under The Hague Convenion And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon

5/22/2023: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - Re: Petition For Access To Minor Child To Petitioner Under The Hague Convenion And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon

Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy **

5/22/2023: Warrant - Issued - Warrant in Lieu of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy **

Declaration - of Senior Investigator Claudia Rodriguera

6/20/2023: Declaration - of Senior Investigator Claudia Rodriguera

Warrant - Issued - Protective Custody Warrant ** File Copy **

6/21/2023: Warrant - Issued - Protective Custody Warrant ** File Copy **

Proof of Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Service

Stipulation

6/27/2023: Stipulation

Minute Order as Order After Hearing

6/27/2023: Minute Order as Order After Hearing

Minute Order

6/27/2023: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2023

Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketStipulation; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketMinute Order as Order After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (Protective Custody Warrant ** File Copy ** )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketDeclaration (of Senior Investigator Claudia Rodriguera ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (Warrant in Lieu of Habeas Corpus ** File Copy ** )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (Re: Petition For Access To Minor Child To Petitioner Under The Hague Convenion And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Re: Petitioner For A Warrant In Lieu Of A Writ Of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Re: Points and Authorities In Support Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspect of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketNotice (Re: Notice of Application For Access To The Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspect Of international Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketMiscellaneous (Re: Memorandum Of Law: The Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hague, Oct. 25, 1980; -and- The International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C. 9001, et. seq. ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less