This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 04:34:06 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, BY AND THROUGH THE CITY OF PASADENA VS LUPE TELLEZ DIAZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, BY AND THROUGH THE CITY OF PASADENA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LUPE TELLEZ DIAZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET L. OLDENDORF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1235

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET L. OLDENDORF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA BY AND THROUGH THE CITY OF PASADENA

Defendants

ALDERETE RACHEL

AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 534 CONCORDIA COURT PASADENA ASSESSOR?S PARCEL NUMBER 5713-041-003

RODRIGUEZ DELLA

RUIZ ELINDA R

TELLEZ BARBARA

TELLEZ CHARLES

TELLEZ DIAZ LUPE

TELLEZ ELIAS E

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF ALFRED E. TELLEZ

TRUSTEE OF THE GLORIA TELLEZ MISQUEZ REVOCABLE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RETCHLESS SOPHIA M.

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY KAILA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

10/30/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

Case Management Statement

10/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF SOPHIA M. RETCHLESS RE: OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVIC

10/19/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF SOPHIA M. RETCHLESS RE: OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVIC

Answer

9/25/2023: Answer

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

7/31/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/25/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Jon Pollard in Support of Complaint for Appointment of a Receiver

6/1/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Jon Pollard in Support of Complaint for Appointment of a Receiver

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

6/1/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

6/1/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/1/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

6/1/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/21/2024

Hearing02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2024

Hearing02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/21/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/21/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Lupe Tellez Diaz (Defendant); Elinda R Ruiz (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketDeclaration OF SOPHIA M. RETCHLESS RE: OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVIC; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Lupe Tellez Diaz (Defendant); Elinda R Ruiz (Defendant); As to: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
06/01/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret L. Oldendorf in Department P Pasadena Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Tellez Diaz (Defendant); Elinda R Ruiz (Defendant); TRUSTEE OF THE GLORIA TELLEZ MISQUEZ REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 15, 2020 (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Tellez Diaz (Defendant); Elinda R Ruiz (Defendant); TRUSTEE OF THE GLORIA TELLEZ MISQUEZ REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 15, 2020 (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Tellez Diaz (Defendant); Elinda R Ruiz (Defendant); TRUSTEE OF THE GLORIA TELLEZ MISQUEZ REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 15, 2020 (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketDeclaration of Jon Pollard in Support of Complaint for Appointment of a Receiver; Filed by: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through the CITY OF PASADENA (Plaintiff); As to: Lupe Tellez Diaz (Defendant); Elinda R Ruiz (Defendant); TRUSTEE OF THE GLORIA TELLEZ MISQUEZ REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 15, 2020 (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less