This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:59:21 (UTC).

JERRY TEFFETELLER, ET AL. VS ALFA LAVAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 JERRY TEFFETELLER, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALFA LAVAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7392

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALFA LAVAL INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL. INC.

BARRETTS MINERALS INC.

BLOCK DRUG COMPANY INC.

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC.

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC FKA BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC. FKA MINERAL PIGMENT SOLUTIONS INC.

CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC.

CHATTEM INC.

CLA-VAL CO.

ELLIOTT COMPANY DBA ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY

FMC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

GOULDS PUMPS LLC FKA GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HOPEMAN BROTHERS INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

ITT LLC FKA ITT INC. FKA ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES INC.

J.T. THORPE & SON INC.

LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDING CORP

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GATT FREDERICK WILLIAM

MARTINOVICH EDWARD

BAILEY BOBBIE RAE

LISTER JOHN RUSSELL

AMEZCUA KAREN

ASPERICUETA ERIKA R.

BERGSTROM EMILY DIANE

CROSS E. RENO

DUFFY JOSEPH

SAYRE JONATHON

TRAN RONALD

Other Attorneys

WILLICK MARC IAN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/26/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE, STRICT LIABILITY, CONSPIRACY, PREMISES LIABILITY, FRAUD AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

5/26/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS (NEGLIGENCE, STRICT LIABILITY, CONSPIRACY, PREMISES LIABILITY, FRAUD AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM)

Notice - NOTICE OF RESOLUTION

5/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF RESOLUTION

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/15/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/15/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

5/15/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Answer - DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

5/15/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Answer - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

5/15/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

5/11/2023: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (NEGLIGENCE, STRICT LIABILITY, CONSPIRACY, PREMISE LIABILITY, FRAUD AND LOSS OF CONSORTIU

5/10/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY (NEGLIGENCE, STRICT LIABILITY, CONSPIRACY, PREMISE LIABILITY, FRAUD AND LOSS OF CONSORTIU

Request for Dismissal

5/9/2023: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/9/2023: Demand for Jury Trial - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

5/9/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAddress for Bobbie Rae Bailey (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer Defendant Imo Industries Inc.S Answer To Complaint For Personal Injury Asbestos (Negligence, Strict Liability, Conspiracy, Premises Liability, Fraud And Loss Of Consortium); Filed by: IMO Industries, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Resolution; Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff); As to: Alfa Laval, Inc. (Defendant); Elliott Company (Defendant); Goulds Pumps LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Sterling Flued Systems (USA), LLC to Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Pfizer Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Phizer Inc. to Pfizer Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Jonathon Sayre (Attorney): First Name changed from JONATHON to Jonathon; Last Name changed from SAYRE to Sayre; Organization Name changed from CMBG3 LAW P.C. to CMBG3 Law P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Karen Amezcua (Attorney): Organization Name changed from CMBG3 Law to CMBG3 Law LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDefendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury Asbestos; Filed by: Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Defendant); As to: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Cla-Val Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff); As to: Viad Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Death of Plaintiff Jerry Teffeteller; Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff); As to: Alfa Laval, Inc. (Defendant); Armstrong International. Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff); As to: Alfa Laval, Inc. (Defendant); Armstrong International. Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff); As to: Alfa Laval, Inc. (Defendant); Armstrong International. Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jerry Teffeteller (Plaintiff); Sharon Teffeteller (Plaintiff); As to: Alfa Laval, Inc. (Defendant); Armstrong International. Inc. (Defendant); Barretts Minerals Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less