This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2023 at 11:08:16 (UTC).

AARON BOWMAN VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 AARON BOWMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1763

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWMAN AARON

Defendants

AIRPORT MARINA FORD

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MORTENSON MICHAEL DONN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

6/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/12/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/8/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/26/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Airport Marina Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Aaron Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Airport Marina Ford (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/25/2023; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Aaron Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Service Date: 06/08/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Aaron Bowman (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/12/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 55 - Hon. Malcolm Mackey; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAddress for Tionna Dolin, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Aaron Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Airport Marina Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Aaron Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Airport Marina Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Aaron Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Airport Marina Ford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less