This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 19:55:01 (UTC).

GLASSWERKS LA, INC. VS THE AMERICANA AT BRAND, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2023 GLASSWERKS LA, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against THE AMERICANA AT BRAND, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1800

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLASSWERKS LA INC.

Defendant

THE AMERICANA AT BRAND LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYKULSKI DANA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/23/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/23/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/23/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/23/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

04/24/2024

Hearing04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2024

Hearing03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ashfaq G. Chowdhury in Department E Glendale Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Glendale Courthouse in Department D - Hon. Ralph C. Hofer; Reason: Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Glasswerks LA, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Americana At Brand, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Glasswerks LA, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Americana At Brand, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Glasswerks LA, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Americana At Brand, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less